Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, S. Howard, Kipke, Malone, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that specified members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education be elected at specified elections; requiring that specified members of the county board be appointed; providing for the residency, terms of office, and filling of a vacancy of specified members of the county board; authorizing the Anne Arundel County Board of Elections to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0444 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108, 3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-10, 3-2B-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM