Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Hettleman, Pendergrass, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a State plan amendment to the Family Planning Program; altering from 6 to 12 months the time period for a single dispensing of a supply of prescription contraceptives under certain Programs; requiring, by October 1, 2020, the Department, along with the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, to establish a presumptive eligibility process and integrate a certain process for the Family Planning Program into the Maryland Health Connection; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516988/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {516988/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-140, 15-148 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM