Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Long, Afzali, Buckel, Cluster, Grammer, Hornberger, C. Howard, Metzgar, Reilly, Shoemaker, Tarlau, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a homeowner submit a specified application to the Department of Assessments and Taxation to receive the homestead property tax credit; repealing specified deadlines and procedures for filing the application for the homestead property tax credit; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller assist the Department with specified matters relating to applications for the homestead property tax credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0375
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM