Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physician Licensing Reciprocity
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Jalisi, Lam, Morhaim, Queen, Krebs, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, and Saab
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to license specified applicants to practice medicine who became licensed or certified as a physician in another jurisdiction under specified requirements, are in good standing in the other jurisdiction, submit the Board-required application, and pay the Board-imposed application fee and whose jurisidiction offers a similar reciprocal licensure for physicians.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {746783/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {243626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {746783/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {243626/1 Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61A
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM