Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Anderson, Carter, Moon, and Smith
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the group of persons who may file a specified petition for postconviction DNA testing or a database or log search; and clarifying what scientific identification evidence the State is required to preserve under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {572910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments {572910/1 Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (123-15) 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM