Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Terrorist Watchlist
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the sale, rental, or transfer of a regulated firearm, rifle, or shotgun to a person who is on the Terrorist Watchlist maintained by the Federal Bureau of Investigation; and prohibiting the Secretary of State Police from issuing a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun to a person listed on the Terrorist Watchlist.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-134, 5-144, 5-207, 5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM