Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Maintenance Incentive Funding Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Holmes, Lehman, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the annual State budget for each county board of education to support the maintenance of school buildings and equipment; requiring a certain appropriation to be in addition to any other State funds provided to the county board in a certain fiscal year; and requiring each county board to use certain funds only for the maintenance of school buildings and equipment.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0586
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Maintenance Incentive Funding Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - School Maintenance Incentive Funding Act of 2019
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-221 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM