Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Barron, Cardin, Chang, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Hettleman, Kaiser, Kelly, McComas, McIntosh, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public library from charging a fine for overdue library materials on a minor's library materials; prohibiting a public library from charging a replacement fee for a minor's overdue library materials until 21 days after the date the materials were due; requiring a public library to cancel a fee if a minor's overdue materials are returned; requiring the Governor to include $7,500,000 in fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter in the annual operating or capital budget for county library capital projects; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0524
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {215668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-16)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {215668/1 Adopted 42
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (117-16) 43A
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49B
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/20/2020 2:01 PM