Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Dumais, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exception for a specified person from the prohibition against carrying or transporting a specified firearm under specified circumstances; requiring a court to inform a person convicted of a specified offense that the person is prohibited from possessing a firearm under specified provisions of law; requiring the court to advise the person that specified proof must be provided to the court that specified firearms owned by the person or in the person's possession have been transferred from the person's possession; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0943
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {632910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {243622/1 Rejected (52-82)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-43)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138477/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138477/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {632910/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {243622/1 Rejected (52-82) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-43) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {138477/1 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {138477/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203, 4-302 )
(   5-133, 5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM