Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Anderson, Atterbeary, Brooks, Busch, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Platt, B. Robinson, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the carrying or possession of specified firearms on the property of public institutions of higher education; providing for specified exceptions to the prohibition; and requiring the public institution of higher education to post signs in prominent locations on the property of the public institution of higher education, including at entrances to and exits from the property, designed to provide notice of the prohibition on the possession of firearms.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0906
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0311 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644169/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Barnes) {513224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {113921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (81-54)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {644169/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 40
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Barnes) {513224/1 Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78) 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {113921/1 Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82) 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (81-54) 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 45
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Wilson, C.) {113921/01 Adopted
3/09/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Afzali) {343521/01 Rejected
3/09/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Simonaire) {513222/01 Rejected
3/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Barnes, B.) {513224/01 Adopted
3/09/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Rey) {553923/02 Rejected
3/09/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Rey) {643422/03 Rejected
3/08/2016 Amendments House - (Appropriations) {644169/01 Adopted
3/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Flanagan) {693527/01 Rejected
3/09/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Hornberger) {863222/01 Rejected
3/11/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Howard, S.) {863923/01 Rejected
2/10/2016 Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
3/11/2016 Text - Third - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
3/07/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
3/09/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83) - 03/09/16
3/09/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78) - 03/09/16
3/09/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81) - 03/09/16
3/09/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83) - 03/09/16
3/09/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82) - 03/09/16
3/11/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78) - 03/11/16
3/11/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82) - 03/11/16
3/12/2016 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (81-54) - 03/12/16
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
(   15-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM