Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Establishment License
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners of Anne Arundel County to issue a retail establishment license to the owner of a licensed retail establishment; specifying that a retail establishment license authorizes the holder to provide without charge beer, wine, and liquor for consumption on the premises of the retail establishment; requiring the Board to determine the quantity of beer, wine, and liquor that may be served to any one person per day; establishing the amount of a specified fee; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 8-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM