Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the administration and management of the Telecommunications Access of Maryland and Telecommunications Devices and Distribution of Accessible Information for Disabled Individuals programs from the Department of Information Technology to the Department of Disabilities; requiring the Department of Disabilities to provide staff, including a director, to the Governor's Advisory Board for Telecommunications Relay; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0851
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Text - Third - Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-114, 7-120, 7-801, 7-801 through 7-806, 7-803, 7-804, 7-806, 7-901, 7-901 through 7-906, 7-902, 7-903, 7-905, 7-906 )
(   3A-501 through 3A-506, 3A-601 through 3A-606 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:15 PM