Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equal Pay Commission - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, Atterbeary, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Busch, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Platt, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Stein, Tarlau, Vallario, M. Washington, P. Young, Aumann, Jameson, Queen, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, C. Wilson, Barkley, Carey, Frick, Glenn, Kramer, Lisanti, Vaughn, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Equal Pay Commission in the Division of Labor and Industry; providing for the composition, chair, and terms of specified members of the Commission; requiring, to the extent practicable, the composition of the Commission to reflect the race, gender, and geographic diversity of the population of the State; requiring the Commission to submit a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2017 and on or before December 15 of each year thereafter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733496/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {663522/1 Rejected (52-89)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-19)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {733496/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate Davis) Adopted 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {663522/1 Rejected (52-89) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (121-19) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM