Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drug Benefit Plan Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Buckel, Ciliberti, Corderman, Howard, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Reilly, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to reimburse retirees from State employment, certain spouses, and certain dependent children for certain prescription drug costs under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drug Benefit Plan Reimbursement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM