Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Anderson, Brooks, Busch, Cullison, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Lam, Lisanti, Luedtke, Patterson, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, Sanchez, Smith, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, West, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a specified coverage requirement that applies to specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations includes coverage for digital tomosynthesis under specified circumstances; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0648
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-814 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM