Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the fee which a homeowners association may impose for a certain inspection from $50 to $100; establishing that a homeowners association shall be composed of all lot owners and that the bylaws may authorize the delegation of any power of the homeowners association; establishing certain powers of the board of directors of a homeowners association; requiring certain notice of certain meetings be provided to members of a homeowners association a certain period of time before the meeting and in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0883
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 23
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11B-106, 11B-106.2, 11B-106.3, 11B-111, 11B-111.7, 11B-112, 11B-112.1, 11B-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM