Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey and Norman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a purchaser in a foreclosure sale, within 60 days after the entry of a final and nonappealable order ratifying a sale in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property, to close on a transaction to purchase real property and record a deed transferring title, or to record, among specified land records, the final order of ratification and specified information; and defining "residential property".
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0508 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM