Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, Jacobs, and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to use a fair market value determined in accordance with certain provisions of law for up to 2 years after the date on which the Foundation was first requested in writing to purchase the easement.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM