Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain mortgage servicer from commencing or completing an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust during a state of emergency and catastrophic health emergency; requiring a servicer to grant a forbearance to a borrower under certain circumstances; prohibiting a period of forbearance from lasting more than 180 days except under certain circumstances; requiring a servicer to notify a borrower of a certain right to mediation under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0724
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Reassigned to Economic Matters Environment and Transportation 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
(   7-105,   7-601 through 7-611 )
Last Updated: 3/2/2021 2:15 PM
Click to return on the top page