Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cosmetic Surgical Facilities - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations for specified cosmetic surgical facilities; authorizing the Secretary to investigate specified complaints relating to cosmetic surgical facilities; requiring specified complaints to be referred to specified health occupations boards; altering definitions; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {436687/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {436687/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 59
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-3C-01 through 19-3C-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM