Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Modification
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying specified standards for the involuntary admission of specified individuals who have experienced a drug overdose to specified facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital to include an individual who has a mental disorder or is not a minor, has experienced a drug overdose, and has health insurance coverage as a dependent on the parent's health insurance plan; modifying specified standards for petitions for the emergency evaluation of specified individuals who have experienced a drug overdose; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Modification
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-617, 10-622, 10-623, 10-632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM