Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public servant from conducting a specified inappropriate search of a minor without probable cause that the minor is concealing contraband or a weapon or without the consent of the parent or guardian of the minor; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; and defining terms.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1106 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM