Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
Sponsored by
Delegates Corderman, Buckel, Cassilly, Krebs, Malone, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring individuals convicted of child abuse to register with a certain supervising authority by a certain time and to register annually with a local law enforcement unit for a certain term; requiring a certain registration to include a digital image that shall be updated at least once each year; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a State child abuse registry and to provide certain information on the Internet; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0358
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-7A-01 through 11-7A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM