Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other Charges
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "tuition" to include specified other charges for attending a public institution of higher education; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM