Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 409-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to install an outdoor synthetic turf field at each public high school in the county during a specified period of time; requiring outdoor synthetic turf fields to be constructed for joint use; requiring specified expenditures to be deemed eligible public school construction costs or capital improvement costs by the Interagency Committee on School Construction for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1108 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-131 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM