Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Epinephrine Availability and Use - Policy
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing nonpublic schools in the State to establish a policy to authorize specified school personnel to administer auto-injectable epinephrine to specified students under specified circumstances; requiring specified policies to include specified information; providing that specified nurses and specified school personnel may not be held personally liable for specified acts or omissions except in specified circumstances; and defining terms.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {735361/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) {473928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764034/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {735361/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) {473928/1 Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {764034/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 63
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-426.2, 7-426.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM