Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Clippinger, Howard, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Niemann, Swain, Valderrama, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, in a specified revocation of probation proceeding, to consider the results of a specified preliminary breath test of alcohol concentration as evidence that the defendant failed to abstain from the use of alcohol under specified circumstances; authorizing the State to use the results of a preliminary breath test to prove probable cause or reasonable grounds or in a specified revocation of probation proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM