Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College Affordability Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Kaiser, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barve, Branch, Busch, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public institution of higher education from referring a delinquent student account or debt to the Central Collection Unit except under specified circumstances; requiring the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to develop and implement a specified marketing plan regarding the availability of a State contribution; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission and the Department of Legislative Services to hire a consultant to evaluate the effectiveness of the Office of Student Financial Assistance; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0676
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {195361/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {353620/1 Rejected (48-84)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-45)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {519230/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {519230/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {883126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-45)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {195361/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {353620/1 Rejected (48-84) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (89-45) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {519230/1 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {519230/1 Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {883126/1 Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) 57
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-45) 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-119, 18-114, 18-1401, 18-1402, 18-1905.1, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-03, 18-19A-04, 18-19A-04.1, 18-19A-05, 18-301, 18-302, 18-303, 18-304, 18-306 )
(   10-207, 10-208, 10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM