Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Donations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain summary of election law prepared by the State Board of Elections address compliance and reporting requirements for campaign finance entities and certain persons; altering the definition of "donation" for certain provisions of law requiring that certain persons disclose donations in certain reports filed with the State Board to include only donations that the donor and certain persons agree may be used for certain political purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Donations - Reporting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Donations - Reporting Requirements
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-103, 13-208, 13-301, 13-306, 13-307, 13-309.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM