Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting a Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora and Clippinger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals who are convicted of specified alcohol-related driving offenses involving transportation of a minor under the age of 16 years to successfully complete the Ignition Interlock System Program.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0032 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {202712/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {202712/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-404.1, 21-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM