Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Responsible Tobacco Retailing Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; repealing specified exemptions from licensure for specified retailers of specified tobacco products; increasing specified licensure fees for specified retailers of specified tobacco products; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.5-101, 16.5-104, 16.5-201, 16.5-203, 16.5-204, 16.5-205, 16.5-213, 16-201, 16-202, 16-204, 16-206, 16-207, 16-210, 16-212, 16-216, 16-306 )
(   24-1701 through 24-1708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM