Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program MC/PG 113-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission, in consultation with the governing body of a specified county, to establish a Certified County-Based Business Participation Program for a specified purpose; authorizing the Commission to use specified incentives and bonuses to achieve the designated goals of the Program; requiring the Commission to report annually to specified delegations of the General Assembly and the Montgomery and Prince George's county councils and county executives by December 1; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {636985/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {636985/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 15-401 through 15-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM