Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Arora, Braveboy, Carter, Clippinger, Harper, Haynes, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Stukes, Summers, Tarrant, Vaughn, and Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small Businesses; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to examine and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM