Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Anderson, Carr, Frush, Gutierrez, Lam, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for the form and content of specified livestock production contracts; requiring livestock production contracts to be reviewed by the Attorney General; establishing that contract producers have specified rights; prohibiting specified contractors from engaging in or allowing their employees or agents to engage in specified practices; establishing specified civil and criminal penalties for violation of the Act; providing for enforcement of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101 through 24-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM