Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to issue notice of the date, time, and location of a hearing, as soon as practicable after the hearing is scheduled, to all specified municipalities, civic associations, homeowners' associations, and condominium associations under specified circumstances; authorizing specified entities that request to receive notice under the Act to elect to receive written or electronic notice; increasing specified annual license fees in Prince George's County; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453891/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964638/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Rejected (27-104)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {453891/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {964638/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Rejected (27-104) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Passed Enrolled 71
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-1001, 26-1006, 26-1008, 26-1009, 26-101, 26-102, 26-1104, 26-1105, 26-1201, 26-1501, 26-1511, 26-1512, 26-1601, 26-1614, 26-1616, 26-1702, 26-1801, 26-1803, 26-2003, 26-2004, 26-2006, 26-2605, 26-601, 26-604, 26-801, 26-804, 26-902, 26-903, 4-208, 4-209, 4-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM