Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding to nine the membership of the Board of License Commissioners of Prince George's County; requiring the Governor to appoint at least one commissioner from each legislative district in the county; requiring specified central committees to designate each commissioner serving on June 30, 2014, as an eligible candidate, with a specified exception; providing that the compensation for the Howard County Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board shall be the amount set by the Howard County Council; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423896/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {423896/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM