Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D (Waterfront) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 315-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition against issuing a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Prince George's County; establishing a Class D (waterfront) beer, wine, and liquor license that the Board of License Commissioners of the County may issue to an establishment in a waterfront entertainment retail complex; establishing the privileges for the license; authorizing dancing and entertainment activities on the licensed premises in a specified manner; providing for the hours of operation of the licensed premises; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-1018.1, 26-102, 26-1601, 26-2004, 26-2707, 26-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM