Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Proceeds - Parks and Recreation Departments
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Glenn, Anderson, Boteler, Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Fisher, George, Harper, Haynes, Kipke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Myers, Oaks, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Tarrant, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute lottery proceeds from the third week of July every year to specified counties to provide funding for county parks and recreation departments; providing that the distribution to a county may occur only with the approval of the governing body of the county; providing that the money distributed under the Act shall provide additional revenue for county parks and recreation departments and may not supplant any other funds provided to those departments; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-120, 9-120.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM