Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsored by
Delegates Sanchez and Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations establishing certain procedures to address cheating and the use of cheating or thieving devices in certain video lottery facilities, parking areas, and adjacent facilities by certain persons or individuals; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations ensuring that certain individuals are charged with criminal trespass; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM