Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program - Study PG/MC 108-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to coordinate with the Prince George's County public school system to study the development of the Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program that integrates math, reading, science, technology, and social sciences content into summer parks and recreation programs offered in Prince George's County; requiring the Commission to report on the feasibility of implementing the Program to the Prince George's County House Delegation on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {155667/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program PG/MC 108-20
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {155667/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program - Study PG/MC 108-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 1:50 PM