Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Hucker, Barkley, Barnes, Bobo, Braveboy, Clippinger, Cullison, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Impallaria, Kramer, Love, McHale, A. Miller, Mitchell, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, S. Robinson, Valderrama, Vaughn, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing specified employees a total of 6 workweeks of unpaid parental leave in a 12-month period under specified circumstances; authorizing an employer to deny unpaid parental leave to an eligible employee under specified circumstances; authorizing, under specified circumstances, an employer to require an eligible employee, or an eligible employee to elect, to substitute paid leave for any part of or all of the period of parental leave; requiring employers to maintain health coverage during the duration of parental leave; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0737
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243497/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-36)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887674/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-41)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {243497/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2 Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (98-36) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {887674/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 57
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (92-41) 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103, 3-1201 through 3-1211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM