Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr and Feldmark
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "economic development program" for purposes of the data collection, tracking, and reporting requirements of the Maryland Jobs Development Act to include certain tax credit programs; and requiring the Department of Commerce, on or before December 31, 2020, to make available on the Department's website, in a certain format certain information relating to the recipients of economic development program tax credits or financial assistance and to update that information annually.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 10:34 AM