Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Companies - Gas - Prohibition on Purchase from Unsafe Company
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Morhaim, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public service company from purchasing gas from a company for distribution that has not installed specified safety equipment on gas transmission lines under its ownership or control, that does not employ specified best practices and technology, or that does not comply with all applicable State and federal safety standards and reporting requirements.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0606
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM