Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Condominiums - Limit on Assessments PG 419-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing an exception to the requirement that funds for the payment of specified common expenses be obtained by assessment against the unit owners in a specified proportion; providing that, notwithstanding any rule, declaration, or bylaw, in Prince George's County, a unit owner may not be charged an assessment that exceeds 20% of any mortgage payments the unit owner is required to make on the unit during the period covered by the assessment; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM