Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Anderson, Clippinger, Folden, Glenn, Sanchez, Walker, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from wearing, carrying, or transporting a handgun loaded with ammunition on or about the person or in a vehicle under certain circumstances; prohibiting a court from suspending any part of certain sentences for persons who have previously been convicted of certain offenses; clarifying that certain sentences are mandatory minimum sentences; providing that a certain mandatory minimum sentence may not be imposed unless the State's Attorney notifies the defendant at least 30 days before the trial of the State's intentions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {942916/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-5)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment {318476/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Handgun - Subsequent Offender
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {942916/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-5) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Referred Rules 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {318476/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment {318476/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender
(   4-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page