Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court by repealing provisions specifying that the juvenile court does not have jurisdiction over a child at least a certain age alleged to have committed certain acts.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page