Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Kelly, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified units of the State that provide health and human services to procure the services of 2-1-1 Maryland to operate public information telephone lines or hotlines in accordance with specified provisions of law unless the unit makes specified determinations and provides specified documentation to 2-1-1 Maryland; authorizing the Board of Public Works to adopt specified regulations; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page