Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Let's Play Maryland Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Campos, Chang, Haynes, Korman, Lierman, A. Miller, Morales, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, Vaughn, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Let's Play Maryland Pilot Program in the Governor's Office for Children; specifying the purpose of the Program; specifying eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; authorizing the Office, beginning on July 1, 2016, to award grants to sports organizations or leagues under the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget for fiscal year 2017 and fiscal year 2018 a $500,000 appropriation for the Program; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-1201 through 8-1209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM