Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Sponsored by
Chair, Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Maryland Department of Labor, and the Department of Human Services to make certain reports to the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness on or before November 15, 2020, and November 15, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0973
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2020 8:08 AM