Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Transport of Weapons on School Property - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Cluster, and Folden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a specified prohibition on carrying or possessing a specified weapon on public school property does not include a specified retired law enforcement officer who is a parent, guardian, or visitor of a student attending a school located on the public school property under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0919 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM